advertisement

Ready Group I can understand and use the grid method to solve multiplication problems. What is the grid method? Look at 12 x 3 = x 1 0 + 2 3 3 0 + 6 Have a go at some of these. 1) 22 x 2 = 2) 23 x 3 = 3) 16 x 4 = 4) 25 x 5= 5) 26 x 6 = 6) 29 x 5 = 7) 47 x 7 = 8) 63 x 8 = 9) 83 x 3= 10) 53 x 5 = 11) 17 x 19 = 12) 19 x 14 = Extension: Make your own single-digit number multiplication using the dice to create numbers. Steady Group I can use the grid method for multiplying numbers together. I can use this method to solve word problems. Look at the example. Method 1 1) 2 3 x 4 2 = x 2 0 + 4 0 8 0 0 + 2 4 0 3 1 2 0 6 Have a go at these: 1) 3 x 42 = 2) 2 x 32 = 3) 84 x 13 = 4) 75 x 14 = 5) 55 x 13 = 6) 84 x 22 = 7) 42 x 22 = 8) 56 x 16 = 9) 38 x 28 = 10) 45 x 83 = 11) 67 x 23 = 12) 45 x 24 = 13) 134 x 54 = 14) 131 x 42 = Extension: Think of problems that you could try. Use the place value dice to create your problems. Go Group I can use the grid method for multiplying numbers together. I can use this method to solve word problems. Look at the example. Method 1 1) 2 3 x 4 2 = x 2 0 + 4 0 8 0 0 + 2 4 0 3 1 2 0 6 Have a go at these: 1) 83 x 42 = 2) 82 x 32 = 3) 84 x 43 = 4) 75 x 24 = 5) 55 x 33 = 6) 84 x 52 = 7) 142 x 122 = 8) 156 x 156 = 9) 238 x 328 = 10) 345 x 283 = 11) 267 x 223 = 12) 345 x 245 = 13) 334 x 354 = 14) 331 x 442 = Extension: Think of problems that you could try. Use the place value dice to create your problems. Ready 2 Group I can understand and use the grid method to solve multiplication problems. What is the grid method? Look at 12 x 3 = 1 0 + 2 3 3 0 + 6 12 12 0 x 12 12 24 Have a go at some of these. 1) 12 x 2 = 2) 13 x 2 = 3) 14 x 2 = 4) 15 x 2= 5) 16 x 2 = 6) 19 x 2 = 7) 27 x 2 = 8) 33 x 2 = 9) 13 x 2= 10) 23 x 2 = 11) 37 x 2 = 12) 29 x 2 = 26