04-01-11-038-s

advertisement
Score
9
04-01-11-038-s
Name:
Date:
Subject: Year 4 Maths
Sheet: Lattice multiplication
Lattice Multiplication
Example:
Use the lattice method to multiply 45 × 23
1. Arrange 45 and 23 along the top and side of the grid.
2. Multiply 2 × 5. Then multiply 2 × 4.
Multiply 3 × 5. Then multiply 3 × 4. Write the answers as shown in the lattice.
3. Add the numbers along each diagonal starting at the right.
For the sum 10, write 0. Then add 1 to the sum along the diagonal above.
4. Read the answer: 45 × 23 = 1,035
1
0
4
01
8
1
2
3
5
1
2
0
1
3
5
5
Use the lattice method to work out the sums below.
1) 67 × 74 = _________
2) 25 × 39 = _________
3) 12 × 10 = _________
4) 37 × 23 = _________
5) 48 × 62 = _________
6) 78 × 42 = _________
7) 19 × 35 = _________
8) 34 × 59 = _________
9) 93 × 50 = _________
© Primary Leap Ltd. 2016
www.primaryleap.co.uk - Primary Resources